+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/25
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0
On March 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 0 4
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 0
On January 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 0 1
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsor
Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor