+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 3
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor