+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/20
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 1
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Larson Brabandt Wallman
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Armstrong Luick Nelson
- Refused to concur
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 1
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor