+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/20
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/19
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 11:30
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor