+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/14
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/13
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 14
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 5 1
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor