+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/22
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 03/21
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Sent to Governor
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 8
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee