+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/23
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/23
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 70 nays 22
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 6
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report rejected
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Kading Hagert Hanson
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Conley Clemens Bakke
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 66 nays 27
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 2 3
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Transportation
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 30 nays 17
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 01:00
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Management
Type:
Primary Sponsor