+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/28
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/27
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 88 nays 4
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Sanford Schmidt Boe
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Poolman Erbele Heckaman
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 5
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 0 2
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:15
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 01:30
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor