+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/22
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor 04/22
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Kempenich Skarphol Hogan
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Bowman Erbele O'Connell
- Refused to concur
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 23 0 0
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 03:30
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor