+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
- Signed by Governor 05/09
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
- Concurred
On April 7, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0
On April 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate (12)
On March 31, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0
On March 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
On February 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
On January 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor