+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
- Signed by Governor 05/05
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 0 1
On March 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On February 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor