+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/16
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
- Received from House
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted yeas 79 nays 14
- Introduced, first reading
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor