+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07
- Signed by Speaker
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted yeas 79 nays 13
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1
- Committee Hearing 02:00
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor