+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to adopt
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor