+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
- Signed by Speaker
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
- Concurred
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted as amended
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 12 0 2
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 03:45
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor