+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/31
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
- Received from House
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 3 3
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee