+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/17
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
- Received from House
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor