+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 3 nays 41
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
- Received from House
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted yeas 56 nays 32
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 3 3
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor