+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 02/07
- Signed by Speaker
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted yeas 89 nays 0
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 2
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee