+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to adopt
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Finance and Taxation
- Request return from committee
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee