+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to adopt
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted yeas 61 nays 28
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 6 1
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee