+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted yeas 91 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted as amended
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
- Received from House
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor