+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/19
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, adopted
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, adopted yeas 85 nays 3
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor