+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/25
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 34 nays 13
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 10
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Appoint Sen. Davison to replace Sen. Schaible on conference committee
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Rust Schaible Oban
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Owens Zubke Guggisberg
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 28 nays 19
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 7
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:45
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee