+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
- Received from House
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on table
- Second reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 25
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:15
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee