+ − Full Texts (17)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 05/08
- Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
On April 28, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 6
- Emergency clause carried
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 25, 2023 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 68 nays 22, Emergency clause carried
On April 24, 2023 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Weston Lee Cleary
On April 17, 2023 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Rohr K. Anderson Dobervich
On April 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Amendment proposed on floor
- Amendment adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 37 nays 10
- Emergency clause carried
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:30
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 1 1
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:45
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Human Services
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 19, Emergency clause carried
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Rereferred to Human Services
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 04:30
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsor
Dyk
Type:
Primary Sponsor