+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/17
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
- Concurred
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid over one legislative day
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor