+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 39 nays 53
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:10
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor