+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
- Received from House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 15
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor