+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/09
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
- Received from House
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 0
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee