+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/10
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
- Concurred
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 10
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor