+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider failed
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 46 nays 47
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 0
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor