+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/23
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 2
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Davison Fors Marcellais
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Pyle Longmuir Guggisberg
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 0
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:45
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee