+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/26
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 12
- Concurred
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6
- Amendment failed
- Amendment proposed on floor
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
- Received from House
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Laid over one legislative day
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 4 0
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor