+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 58
- Motion to reconsider laid on table
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Rereferred to Political Subdivisions
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor