+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 05/02
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 05/01
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 10
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Schaible Elkin Oban
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Owens Heinert Guggisberg
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 10
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 03:30
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee