+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/30
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/30
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
- Received from House
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 13
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee