+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, without recommendation 5 1 0
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
- Received from House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 38
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 1
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor