+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/26
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/25
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 4
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:30
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor