+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 69
- Concurred
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
- Received from House
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 4
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor