+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass
- Division B lost
- Division A lost
- Division of bill
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 3 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On March 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 29
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 7 2
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 03:15
On January 20, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Request return from committee
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor