+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/22
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/21
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 4
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 10
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Anderson K. Roers Hogan
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Westlind Tveit Dobervich
- Refused to concur
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:00
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
- Received from House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 10
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 18 3 0
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Amendment adopted
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee