+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/10
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 0
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 3
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee