+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/28
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 24 nays 21
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 1 1
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:15
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 27
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee