+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/11
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
- Concurred
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Emergency clause carried
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
- Received from House
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 4, Emergency clause carried
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee