+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/28
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor