+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/13
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/12
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 8
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor