+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 44
On March 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 1
On March 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 3, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
On January 27, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor