+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on table
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 53
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor