+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/02
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/02
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 1
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:15
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee